IN SB0069 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Representatives VanNatter and Cook added as cosponsors
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Representatives VanNatter and Cook added as cosponsors
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Possession of firearms on school property. Exempts certain retired law enforcement officers described in the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act (LEOSA) from the prohibition against carrying a firearm on school property. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Possession of firearms on school property.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Representatives VanNatter and Cook added as cosponsors |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senators Kruse, Niemeyer, Houchin, Glick added as coauthors |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senators Ford Jon, Freeman, Buck, Rogers, Bohacek added as coauthors |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Young M added as third author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |