IN SB0067 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes additional grounds for disqualification of an administrative law judge and replacement procedures. Provides that the proceedings before an administrative law judge are de novo. Conforms summary judgment procedures and electronic service procedures in an administrative proceeding to the procedures under the Indiana Rules of Trial Procedure. Provides that settlement of an administrative matter results in the issuance of a final order that effectuates the settlement in certain cases. Requires additional limited proceedings if the settlement of the matter includes the modification of an environmental permit. Provides that an environmental law judge has the same authority and responsibilities as an administrative law judge.
Title
Procedures in administrative proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 32 | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 86, nays 1 | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-27 | House sponsor: Rep. McMillin | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to the House | |
2011-01-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 46 and nays 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Senator Bray added as second author | |
2011-01-24 | Amendment 1 (Gard), prevailed; | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Broden added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Gard |