IN SB0067 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prescribes trust interpretation rules to protect discretionary interests held by beneficiaries. Precludes creditor actions against certain trust interests. Authorizes matrimonial trusts. Authorizes a trustee to decant a trust. Authorizes a trustee to close a trust when a beneficiary cannot be found by selling the beneficiary's share and depositing the proceeds with the clerk of the court. Requires the clerk to hold the proceeds for the use and benefit of the person or persons thereafter determined by law to be entitled to the proceeds. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the probate code study commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-26 Senator Broden added as second author
2010-01-26 Cosponsor: Rep. Foley
2010-01-26 House sponsor: Rep. VanHaaften
2010-01-26 Referred to the House
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: Yeas 50, Nays 0
2010-01-26 Senator Taylor added as coauthor
2010-01-19 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback