IN SB0066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Senator Bassler added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Senator Bassler added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption subsidies. Prohibits the department of child services (department), a licensed child placing agency, or a court from considering the following when determining the suitability of a prospective adoptive parent: (1) The eligibility of the prospective adoptive parent to receive adoption assistance payments or an adoption subsidy. (2) The amount of the adoption assistance payments or adoption subsidy for which the prospective adoptive parent qualifies. Requires, with certain exceptions, that the department: (1) enter into an agreement with each adoptive parent of a child with special needs who is eligible for an adoption subsidy to provide an adoption subsidy for the child; and (2) allocate to the adoption assistance account funds necessary to make the adoption subsidy payments. Prohibits the department from terminating an adoption subsidy agreement with an adoptive parent due to a lack of sufficient funds in the adoption assistance account. Provides that the amount of adoption subsidy payments may not be less than an amount equal to 50% of the amount that would be payable by the department for the monthly cost of care of the adopted child in a foster family home at the time that: (1) the adoption subsidy agreement is made; or (2) the subsidy is payable under the terms of the agreement; whichever is greater. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Adoption subsidies.
Sponsors
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Houchin added as coauthors |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niezgodski |