IN SB0066 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the following qualify as a renewable energy resources for purposes of the statute that provides financial incentives for clean coal and energy projects: (1) Low temperature, oxygen starved gasification of municipal solid waste. (2) Methane recovered from landfills for the production of electricity. (3) Coal bed methane derived from a naturally occurring biogenic process.
Title
Utility matters.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Beverly Gard [R] | Sen. Allen Paul [R] |
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 96 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-26 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 473: yeas 47, nays 2 | |
2011-04-25 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2011-04-13 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 3 ( Wolkins) and prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-13 | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed; Roll Call 520: yeas 72, nays 24 | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment 2 (Wolkins), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-12 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Representative Koch added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Tallian added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Paul added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | House sponsor: Rep. Wolkins | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to the House | |
2011-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 48 and nays 1 | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Buck added as third author | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Charbonneau added as second author | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Gard |