IN SB0064 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Indiana youth service program. Provides that the Center of Excellence in Leadership of Learning at the University of Indianapolis shall develop a proposal to establish the Indiana youth service program (program) to provide high school students with the opportunity to learn various skills and participate in service at host sites throughout Indiana. Provides that the Center of Excellence in Leadership of Learning at the University of Indianapolis may seek input on the program from the department of workforce development, the commission for higher education, and the legislative services agency. Provides that the Center of Excellence in Leadership of Learning at the University of Indianapolis shall present the proposed program, including costs of administration, to the budget committee and the general assembly for review and consideration not later than December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana youth service program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 40, nays 10
2020-01-27SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2020-01-27SenateAmendment #1 (Ruckelshaus) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-01-07SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Ruckelshaus

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback