IN SB0064 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana youth service program. Provides that the Center of Excellence in Leadership of Learning at the University of Indianapolis shall develop a proposal to establish the Indiana youth service program (program) to provide high school students with the opportunity to learn various skills and participate in service at host sites throughout Indiana. Provides that the Center of Excellence in Leadership of Learning at the University of Indianapolis may seek input on the program from the department of workforce development, the commission for higher education, and the legislative services agency. Provides that the Center of Excellence in Leadership of Learning at the University of Indianapolis shall present the proposed program, including costs of administration, to the budget committee and the general assembly for review and consideration not later than December 1, 2020.
Title
Indiana youth service program.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cook |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ruckelshaus) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ruckelshaus |