IN SB0064 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a homeowners association from adopting or enforcing certain restrictive covenants or homeowners association rules concerning the display of political signs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Display of political signs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 5
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-03 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: Yeas 96, Nays 0
2010-02-22 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-11 Representatives Borror and Barnes added as cosponsors
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2010-01-26 House sponsor: Rep. Fry
2010-01-26 Referred to the House
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: Yeas 48 and Nays 1
2010-01-26 Senator Tallian added as second author
2010-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-11 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Delph

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback