IN SB0063 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
Pending: Senate Homeland Security & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Law enforcement powers of fire investigators. Provides that a fire investigator appointed after June 30, 2024, who is a member of: (1) a fire department that provides service to a first or second class city (city); or (2) a city fire department; may exercise police powers for the city if certain requirements are satisfied, including meeting basic training standards established by the law enforcement training board (board) and written notification is sent from the city fire chief to the city police chief and county sheriff. (Under current law, the fire investigator must be authorized to exercise police power by the police chief and fire chief of the first class or second class city.) Provides that a fire investigator who exercised police powers before July 1, 2024, and has not completed the basic training standards established by the board must complete supplemental training and education established by the board to continue exercising police powers after June 30, 2026. Allows the board to adopt interim rules to establish the supplemental training and educational requirements for fire investigators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement powers of fire investigators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2024-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Ford J.D.

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback