IN SB0062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sale of tax sale properties to nonprofits. Permits a county treasurer in a county having a consolidated city to offer for sale a tract or item of real property on the county auditor's tax sale list: (1) that is not used as a person's principal place of residence and receiving a homestead standard deduction for the most recent assessment date;(2) that is unsold after two or more public sales; and (3) for which a set off has not been obtained against the delinquent debt owed on the real property; to an eligible nonprofit entity prior to a regularly scheduled tax sale. Provides that not more than 5% of the real property on the tax sale list may be sold to eligible nonprofit entities. Requires an eligible nonprofit entity to file certain information with the county executive not later than 45 days prior to the tax sale in order to participate in an early sale. Requires, before January 1, 2023, and before each January 1 thereafter, the county executive to provide an annual report to the legislative council concerning the sale of tax sale properties to eligible nonprofit entities.
Title
Sale of tax sale properties to nonprofits.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Mitch Gore [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 123 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 353: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Dissent withdrawn |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Buck and Taylor G |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Lanane |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Borders, Lyness, Bauer M, Errington, Gore and Pryor |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Karickhoff and Moed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 91, nays 2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Representatives Karickhoff and Gore M added as cosponsors |
2022-02-21 | House | Amendment #1 (Moed) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Moed removed as cosponsor |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Moed added as sponsor |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Teshka J removed as sponsor |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Pryor and Moed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Teshka |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as second author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Taylor G) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |