IN SB0062 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School substance abuse prevention pilot program and fund. Provides the department of education (department), in collaboration with organizations that have expertise in school based substance abuse prevention, shall develop: (1) materials to assist schools to develop a formal substance abuse prevention policy; and (2) a model school based substance abuse prevention policy. Establishes the school substance abuse prevention pilot program (program). Provides the department shall administer the program. Establishes the school substance abuse prevention pilot program fund to: (1) provide grants to schools to use for evidence based substance abuse prevention programming; (2) provide grants to schools to embed mental
Title
School substance abuse prevention pilot program and fund. Provides the department of education (department), in collaboration with organizations that have expertise in school based substance abuse prevention, shall develop: (1) materials to assist schools to develop a formal substance abuse prevention policy; and (2) a model school based substance abuse prevention policy. Establishes the school substance abuse prevention pilot program (program). Provides the department shall administer the program. Establishes the school substance abuse prevention pilot program fund to: (1) provide grants to schools to use for evidence based substance abuse prevention programming; (2) provide grants to schools to embed mental
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |