IN SB0062 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Public Law 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

2015 ISTEP program. Provides that the department of education (department) may waive certain assessment inspection requirements for purposes of administration of the 2015 ISTEP program. Provides that, if the department waives inspection requirements for any questions on the 2015 ISTEP program, the department must establish criteria to allow a student's parent the opportunity to inspect questions used as part of the 2015 ISTEP program in a manner that will not compromise the validity or integrity of the 2016 ISTEP program. Provides that the department may waive the administration of the social studies portion of ISTEP program during the 2015 administration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2015 ISTEP program. Provides that the department of education (department) may waive certain assessment inspection requirements for purposes of administration of the 2015 ISTEP program. Provides that, if the department waives inspection requirements for any questions on the 2015 ISTEP program, the department must establish criteria to allow a student's parent the opportunity to inspect questions used as part of the 2015 ISTEP program in a manner that will not compromise the validity or integrity of the 2016 ISTEP program. Provides that the department may waive the administration of the social studies portion of ISTEP program during the 2015 administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 22 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-23SenatePublic Law 1
2015-02-23SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-02-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-02-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-02-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-02-23SenateRules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 192: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-23SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-02-23HouseReturned to the Senate with Amendments
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-02-19HouseRepresentatives Ober, Austin, Smith, V. added as cosponsors
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 186: yeas 23, nays 69
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #2 (Cox) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-16HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-22SenateRepresentative Cox added as sponsor
2015-01-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 47, nays 2
2015-01-20SenateSenator Yoder added as second author
2015-01-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/62/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/6/b/fa6b7aa8/SB0062.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/9/a/ff9a539d/SB0062.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/5/e/9f5e00c2/SB0062.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/5/d/795d0afb/SB0062.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/c/c/01cc2090/SB0062.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/2/d/d52d092c/SB0062.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/0/d/150d03f3/SB0062.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/b/1/e0b15fc3/SB0062.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/d/1/bdd18614/SB0062.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/3/d/533d8d50/SB0062.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/d/4/69d4394c/SB0062.19.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/e/f/8befb9a2/SB0062.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/f/d/d5fde401/SB0062.186.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/a/c/e9ac9781/SB0062.188.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/3/5/0c35a807/SB0062.192.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback