IN SB0061 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 227
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission on seclusion and restraint. Requires the commission on seclusion and restraint in schools (commission) to adopt rules concerning reporting requirements for the use of seclusion and restraint by school resource officers. Requires that the commission include a member of the Indiana School Resource Officers Association. Provides that a school corporation, accredited nonpublic school, or charter school must report incidents of seclusion and restraint involving a school resource officer. Provides that the commission may adopt emergency rules. Voids a rule adopted by the commission that excludes school resource officers from the reporting requirements. Makes changes to the duties of the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on seclusion and restraint. Requires the commission on seclusion and restraint in schools (commission) to adopt rules concerning reporting requirements for the use of seclusion and restraint by school resource officers. Requires that the commission include a member of the Indiana School Resource Officers Association. Provides that a school corporation, accredited nonpublic school, or charter school must report incidents of seclusion and restraint involving a school resource officer. Provides that the commission may adopt emergency rules. Voids a rule adopted by the commission that excludes school resource officers from the reporting requirements. Makes changes to the duties of the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 227
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 521: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 541: yeas 96, nays 0
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cook, Washburne, Errington and Smith V
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Clere and DeLaney
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Raatz, Randolph Lonnie M and Crider
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Taylor G
2017-04-10SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-10SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 347: yeas 93, nays 1
2017-03-30HouseRepresentatives Klinker, Cook, DeLaney added as cosponsors
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Clere
2017-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-02-23SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2017-02-23SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2017-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/61/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/6/0/c76095e3/SB0061.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/2/0/bb203a30/SB0061.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/a/d/61ad3fa0/SB0061.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/d/a/b2da5818/SB0061.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/9/7/d39760ad/SB0061.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/7/9/2279ca0e/SB0061.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/7/2/b27202dd/SB0061.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/5/5/b655a638/SB0061.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/0/c/440c2d11/SB0061.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/5/8/b1587c1a/SB0061.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/d/1/a1d149f7/SB0061.192.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/b/1/ffb18b0b/SB0061.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/a/4/e4a4ef6c/SB0061.347.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/d/7/66d751eb/SB0061.521.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/9/2/8092f986/SB0061.541.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback