IN SB0060 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Out of state sex or violent offenders. Provides that a failure to register as a sex or violent offender for an offense originating from another jurisdiction is a Level 5 felony in certain instances.
Title
Out of state sex or violent offenders. Provides that a failure to register as a sex or violent offender for an offense originating from another jurisdiction is a Level 5 felony in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 44 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Washburne |
2018-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senators Delph and Bohacek added as coauthors |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Bohacek removed as third author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Freeman removed as second author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senators Houchin and Holdman added as coauthors |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas |