IN SB0059 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional licensing. Requires the behavioral health and human services licensing board to issue a license to a social worker, clinical social worker, marriage and family therapist, mental health counselor, licensed addiction counselor, licensed clinical addiction counselor, addiction counselor associate, or clinical addiction counselor associate who: (1) has a valid license or certificate to practice from another state or jurisdiction; (2) has passed an examination substantially equivalent to the level for which licensure is being requested; (3) does not have a pending disciplinary proceeding in another state; and (4) pays a fee. Establishes requirements to obtain a license as an addiction
Title
Professional licensing. Requires the behavioral health and human services licensing board to issue a license to a social worker, clinical social worker, marriage and family therapist, mental health counselor, licensed addiction counselor, licensed clinical addiction counselor, addiction counselor associate, or clinical addiction counselor associate who: (1) has a valid license or certificate to practice from another state or jurisdiction; (2) has passed an examination substantially equivalent to the level for which licensure is being requested; (3) does not have a pending disciplinary proceeding in another state; and (4) pays a fee. Establishes requirements to obtain a license as an addiction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Public Law 225 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 500: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 527: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-06 | House | House advisors appointed: VanNatter, Lyness, Klinker and Taylor J |
2017-04-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Frizzell and Austin |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Merritt, Zay and Stoops |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Head and Randolph Lonnie M |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2017-04-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 346: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Amendment #1 (Frizzell) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-28 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | House | Representative Austin added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frizzell |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |