IN SB0059 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eligibility to vote for political party officers. Provides that an individual who will meet the age and residency requirements on the date of the next general, municipal, or special election may vote for precinct committeeman and state convention delegate elected at a primary election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligibility to vote for political party officers. Provides that an individual who will meet the age and residency requirements on the date of the next general, municipal, or special election may vote for precinct committeeman and state convention delegate elected at a primary election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15SenatePublic Law 6
2015-04-15SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-18HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2015-03-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-03-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-12HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-22SenateRepresentative Richardson added as cosponsor
2015-01-22SenateRepresentative Smaltz added as sponsor
2015-01-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-01-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateAmendment #1 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
2015-01-20SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-01-15SenateSenator Walker added as second author
2015-01-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Pete

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/59/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/7/7/a377a9da/SB0059.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/d/5/2fd56a94/SB0059.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/6/f/776f0415/SB0059.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/4/e/9c4ee988/SB0059.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/d/a/49da4b76/SB0059.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/a/4/61a45f6d/SB0059.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/3/0/8130b6a0/SB0059.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/c/8/75c8a788/SB0059.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/4/6/aa4614b6/SB0059.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/4/6/b04603b3/SB0059.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/0/5/4605ae71/SB0059.18.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/2/e/d52e4b0f/SB0059.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/9/2/e8926f86/SB0059.289.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback