IN SB0057 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Defines "synthetic cannabinoid" and "salvia" (salvia divinorum or salvinorin A). Makes possessing, dealing in, manufacturing, or delivering a synthetic cannabinoid, or salvia equivalent to possessing, dealing in, manufacturing, or delivering marijuana, hash oil, or hashish. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Synthetic cannabinoids and salvia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 138
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-25 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 457: yeas 49, nays 1
2011-04-19 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-19 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 558: yeas 93, nays 0
2011-04-18 Amendment 2 (Steuerwald), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-18 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-13 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2011-01-20 Senators Leising, Holdman, Skinner, Broden and Breaux added as coauthors
2011-01-20 Cosponsors: Reps. T. Brown, Truitt and Klinker
2011-01-20 House sponsor: Rep. Yarde
2011-01-20 Referred to the House
2011-01-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 47 and nays 0
2011-01-18 Senator Wyss added as coauthor
2011-01-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-13 Senator Landske added as coauthor
2011-01-12 Senators Paul, M. Young and R. Young added as coauthors
2011-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 Senator Zakas added as coauthor
2011-01-05 Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-05 Coauthored by Senators Steele and Arnold
2011-01-05 Authored by Senators Alting, Charbonneau and Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback