IN SB0055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Choice scholarships. Provides that the department of education shall accept applications for choice scholarship students from November 1 through January 15 for the spring semester of the current school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Choice scholarships. Provides that the department of education shall accept applications for choice scholarship students from November 1 through January 15 for the spring semester of the current school year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2019-02-05SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2019-01-16SenateSenator Freeman added as author
2019-01-16SenateSenator Bray removed as author
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback