IN SB0054 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - House advisors appointed: Davis, Thompson and Klinker
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - House advisors appointed: Davis, Thompson and Klinker
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
FAFSA completion incentive awards. Requires the department of education to establish a Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) completion incentive pilot program. Provides requirements for a school corporation to receive a FAFSA completion incentive award. Provides a formula to determine the amount of a school corporation's FAFSA completion incentive award.
Title
FAFSA completion incentive awards.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | House advisors appointed: Davis, Thompson and Klinker |
2021-04-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Donato and Ford J.D. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Leising and Melton |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Representatives Clere and Smith, V. added as cosponsors |
2021-03-30 | House | Representative Smith, V. removed as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 87, nays 6 |
2021-03-29 | House | Representative Smith, V. added as cosponsor |
2021-03-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon removed as coauthor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Thompson |
2021-02-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 27, nays 20 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Donato added as second author |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |