IN SB0053 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax holiday. Provides a sales and use tax holiday from August 4, 2017, through August 6, 2017, for the following items purchased for a nonbusiness use: (1) An item of clothing, if the sales price of the item does not exceed $35. (2) An item of school instructional material, school supplies, or school art supplies, if the sales price of the item does not exceed $20. Incorporates the definitions of these items as set forth in the May 4, 2016, Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement.
Title
Sales tax holiday. Provides a sales and use tax holiday from August 4, 2017, through August 6, 2017, for the following items purchased for a nonbusiness use: (1) An item of clothing, if the sales price of the item does not exceed $35. (2) An item of school instructional material, school supplies, or school art supplies, if the sales price of the item does not exceed $20. Incorporates the definitions of these items as set forth in the May 4, 2016, Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/53/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/d/1/35d1657b/SB0053.01.INTR.pdf |