IN SB0053 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that for purposes of the statutes governing municipal sewage works, the municipal legislative body may include in an ordinance adopted under the statutes one or more of the following provisions with respect to tenant-occupied property: (1) That sewer fees for the property are payable by the tenant. (2) That sewer fees for the property are payable by the tenant if the property owner or the tenant satisfies certain requirements or conditions that the municipal legislative body includes in the ordinance. (3) That sewer fees for the property do not constitute a lien against the property, subject to certain requirements or conditions set forth in the ordinance. Makes conforming amendments to provisions setting forth the manner in which municipal sewer liens attach and are enforced. Specifies that the authority to adopt these provisions concerning tenant-occupied property does not prohibit a municipality from including in an ordinance adopted under the statutes any other provision that the municipality considers appropriate. Specifies that the authority to adopt these provisions concerning tenant-occupied property does not apply to a conservancy district that provides sewage service. For purposes of the statutes governing municipal storm water works and municipal sewage works, amends provisions requiring notice of fee delinquencies to the owner of tenant-occupied property to provide that the notice of the delinquency must be sent to the owner: (1) regardless of whether the owner has provided an address to which the notice must be sent; and (2) at the last address of the owner as indicated in the records of the county auditor, or to another address specified by the owner in a written notice. Provides that the notice may be sent by first class mail or by certified mail (or

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 005302 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Roll Call 005301 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenatePublic Law 196
2014-03-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 410: yeas 41 and nays 4
2014-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 490: yeas 70 and nays 21
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Pierce added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Wolkins added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Errington added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Culver added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Koch added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Breaux added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Charbonneau added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Broden added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Zakas added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-02-25HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-25HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 273: yeas 76 and nays 19
2014-02-24HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative Burton added as cosponsor.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative Koch added as cosponsor.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Neese added as cosponsor.
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Culver added as sponsor.
2014-01-28SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 45 and nays 4
2014-01-28SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2014-01-27SenateSenator Broden added as second author.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Broden removed as coauthor.
2014-01-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor.
2014-01-07SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Utilities
2014-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/53/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/2/0/7b20dc3f/SB0053.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/d/6/07d63fe7/SB0053.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/8/0/de801b2b/SB0053.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/f/0/93f05820/SB0053.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/3/0/a530d99f/SB0053.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/e/4/39e44125/SB0053.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/f/0/8bf067ac/SB0053.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/e/3/02e3cf3a/SB0053.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/9/0/94908a8a/SB0053.02.COMS.56.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/2/a/ee2aad03/SB0053.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/8/2/3082d063/SB0053.03.COMH.273.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/d/c/b3dc92fb/SB0053.03.COMH.490.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/2/2/7b22d99b/SB0053.03.COMH.410.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback