IN SB0052 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amends penalties for violating certain statutes in IC 14 (natural and cultural resources). Amends certain boating requirements. Repeals a law prohibiting a boat from sounding a horn.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural and cultural resources penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 005202 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 005201 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenatePublic Law 195
2014-03-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 502: yeas 86 and nays 12
2014-03-13SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 435: yeas 47 and nays 1
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Lawson added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Torr added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Arnold added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Pierce added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative McMillin added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Stoops added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Crider added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Randolph added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Steele added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 370: yeas 79 and nays 19
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 52 Amendment #3 (McMillin), prevailed.
2014-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative McMillin added as cosponsor.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Eberhart added as sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 137: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Randolph added as second author.
2014-01-07SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
2014-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/52/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/9/2/6392cec4/SB0052.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/a/b/01ab1dd5/SB0052.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/9/e/df9edbae/SB0052.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/5/9/9f5982a3/SB0052.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/5/d/855d1978/SB0052.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/e/5/15e5f627/SB0052.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/b/9/51b913ae/SB0052.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/5/6/89563ed6/SB0052.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/0/1/eb014342/SB0052.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/d/1/a5d11437/SB0052.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/8/6/c186ca4b/SB0052.02.COMS.137.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/a/e/50ae3710/SB0052.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/0/7/a9070bc9/SB0052.04.ENGH.370.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/8/c/438ce089/SB0052.04.ENGH.502.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/c/4/46c4c408/SB0052.04.ENGH.435.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback