IN SB0050 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Antidiscrimination safeguards. Indicates that the law related to adjudicating a claim or defense that a state or local law, ordinance, or other action substantially burdens the exercise of religion of a person: (1) does not authorize a provider to refuse to offer or provide services, facilities, use of public accommodations, goods, employment, or housing to any member or members of the general public; (2) does not establish a defense to a civil action or criminal prosecution for refusal by a provider to offer or provide services, facilities, use of public accommodations, goods, employment, or housing to any member or members
Title
Antidiscrimination safeguards. Indicates that the law related to adjudicating a claim or defense that a state or local law, ordinance, or other action substantially burdens the exercise of religion of a person: (1) does not authorize a provider to refuse to offer or provide services, facilities, use of public accommodations, goods, employment, or housing to any member or members of the general public; (2) does not establish a defense to a civil action or criminal prosecution for refusal by a provider to offer or provide services, facilities, use of public accommodations, goods, employment, or housing to any member or members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Law 4 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 368: yeas 34, nays 16 |
2015-04-02 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 370: yeas 66, nays 30 |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative Bosma added as conferee |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative Lawson L removed as conferee |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative Bosma removed as advisor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Long added as conferee |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Broden removed as conferee |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Long removed as advisor |
2015-03-31 | House | House Advisors appointed: Bosma and Pelath |
2015-03-31 | House | House Conferees appointed: Frizzell and Lawson L |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Long and Lanane |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Young R Michael and Broden |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Representative Smith, M. added as cosponsor |
2015-03-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 91, nays 3 |
2015-03-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Smith M) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |