IN SB0050 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person less than 16 years of age from using a tanning device in a tanning facility. Repeals a provision requiring a person less than 16 years of age to be accompanied by a parent or guardian when using a tanning device in a tanning facility. Repeals the tanning facility committee. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the health finance commission.)
Title
Minors and tanning devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 005003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 005001 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 005003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 005001 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 82 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 367: yeas 26 and nays 12 |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 312: yeas 69 and nays 23 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Lawson removed as second sponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Lawson added cosponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Zent added as sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 30 and nays 17 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Landske added as third author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |