IN SB0050 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Senator Waterman added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Senator Waterman added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that at least 18 hours before an abortion a pregnant woman seeking an abortion must obtain fetal ultrasound imaging, hear the auscultation of the fetal heart tone if audible, and view and receive a copy of the fetal ultrasound imaging. Specifies that the pregnant woman is responsible for the cost of the fetal ultrasound imaging.
Title
Ultrasound before an abortion.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Scott Schneider [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. John Waterman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senator Waterman added as coauthor | |
2011-01-24 | Senator Steele added as second author | |
2011-01-06 | Senators Schneider and Kruse added as coauthors | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Leising |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0050 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0050.1.html |