IN SB0048 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child sex offenses. Provides that a criminal prosecution of a sex offense committed against a child that is otherwise barred by the statute of limitations may nevertheless be commenced within five years from the date on which: (1) the state discovers DNA evidence; (2) the state learns of a recording that provides evidence sufficient to charge the offender; or (3) a person confesses to the offense. Specifies that a person commits human trafficking if the person pays money to a human trafficking victim. (Current law provides that the person commits the offense by paying money for a human trafficking victim.)
Title
Child sex offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Kyle Walker [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Public Law 3 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-03-15 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2023-03-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-27 | House | Representative Rowray E added as cosponsor |
2023-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor |
2023-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senators Freeman, Sandlin, Koch, Glick added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Senator Walker K added as second author |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |