IN SB0047 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
C and E fund deductions from retirement benefits. Allows a participant in the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan (C and E fund) to authorize a deduction from the participant's monthly retirement benefit for the purpose of paying insurance premiums, charitable contributions, or labor organization dues.
Title
C and E fund deductions from retirement benefits. Allows a participant in the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan (C and E fund) to authorize a deduction from the participant's monthly retirement benefit for the purpose of paying insurance premiums, charitable contributions, or labor organization dues.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 41 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2017-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |