IN SB0046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying storm water fees.
Title
Interim study committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] |
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |