IN SB0042 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Representative Deal added as cosponsor
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Railroad crossings. Subject to available funding, requires the department of transportation to construct, in locations where practical, lanes and signs at railroad crossings on state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad crossings. Subject to available funding, requires the department of transportation to construct, in locations where practical, lanes and signs at railroad crossings on state highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Deal added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-18SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateCosponsors: Representatives Miller and Bartels
2019-02-18SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Jordan
2019-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-12SenateSenators Tomes, Boots, Garten, Merritt, Niemeyer added as coauthors
2019-02-12SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04SenateSenator Crider added as third author
2019-02-04SenateSenator Head added as second author
2019-01-29SenateSenator Doriot added as author
2019-01-29SenateSenator Bray removed as author
2019-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback