IN SB0038 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Application of foreign law. Provides that a court may not apply, enforce, or grant comity, res judicata, claim preclusion, or issue preclusion to a foreign law, ruling, or judgment if doing so would violate the fundamental liberties, rights, and privileges guaranteed by the Constitution of the United States or the Constitution of the State of Indiana. Provides that a provision in a contract or agreement: (1) that provides for the choice of foreign laws in its interpretation; or (2) that provides for the choice of venue or forum; and that would result in a violation of a fundamental liberty, right,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application of foreign law. Provides that a court may not apply, enforce, or grant comity, res judicata, claim preclusion, or issue preclusion to a foreign law, ruling, or judgment if doing so would violate the fundamental liberties, rights, and privileges guaranteed by the Constitution of the United States or the Constitution of the State of Indiana. Provides that a provision in a contract or agreement: (1) that provides for the choice of foreign laws in its interpretation; or (2) that provides for the choice of venue or forum; and that would result in a violation of a fundamental liberty, right,

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-29SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as sponsor
2015-01-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 43, nays 4
2015-01-27SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2015-01-26SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-07SenateSenator Delph added as second author
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback