IN SB0036 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Audiology and speech-language pathology compact. Adopts the audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact. Establishes requirements regarding: (1) speech-language pathology assistants; and (2) the supervision of speech-language pathology support personnel. Requires the speech-language pathology and audiology board to adopt rules not later than June 30, 2023. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Audiology and speech-language pathology compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Barrett, Behning, Campbell |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Olthoff |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Yoder added as coauthors |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |