IN SB0036 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that magistrates who meet certain other criteria may be certified as special judges by the judicial nominating commission. Current law provides for the certification of judges and justices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Magistrates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 3
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-03 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: Yeas 95, Nays 0
2010-02-24 Amendment 1 (Clements), ruled out of order
2010-02-24 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-22 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-02-02 Senator Delph added as coauthor
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Foley
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. L. Lawson
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-01 Senator Head added as second author
2010-02-01 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-21 Senator Bray added as first author
2010-01-21 Senator Long removed as first author
2010-01-21 Committee report: amended, reassigned to Judiciary
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback