IN SB0035 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Speed limits in school zones. Provides that a city, town, or county may establish a speed limit of not less than 20 miles per hour on a street or highway upon which a school is located if the street or highway is under the jurisdiction of the city, town, or county. (Current law provides that the speed limit may not be less than 30 miles per hour outside an urban district.) Removes outdated language.
Title
Speed limits in school zones. Provides that a city, town, or county may establish a speed limit of not less than 20 miles per hour on a street or highway upon which a school is located if the street or highway is under the jurisdiction of the city, town, or county. (Current law provides that the speed limit may not be less than 30 miles per hour outside an urban district.) Removes outdated language.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] |
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Rep. Melanie Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Public Law 29 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Thompson) motion withdrawn voice vote |
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Representative Wright added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | House | Representatives Zent and Smith, M. added as cosponsors |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Representative Schaibley added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |