IN SB0034 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the interstate compact for juveniles. Creates a national interstate commission for juveniles made up of the compact administrators from states that join the interstate compact. Delegates to the interstate compact the authority to adopt rules concerning the transfer of juvenile probationers and parolees between states. Adds members to the state council for interstate adult offender supervision. Provides that the state council for interstate adult offender supervision is also the council for interstate juvenile supervision. Requires an offender and juvenile offender to pay a $125 application fee to apply for a transfer out of state. Requires counties to establish a county offender transportation fund.
Title
Interstate compact for juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 137 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-28 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 484: yeas 48, nays 0 | |
2011-04-26 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 543: yeas 96, nays 1 | |
2011-04-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-13 | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2011-02-15 | House sponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 39 and nays 11 | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Senators Head and Randolph added as coauthors | |
2011-02-10 | Senator Broden added as second author | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Zakas |