IN SB0031 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an indictment or information to be amended to include a habitual offender charge if the amendment is filed at least 30 days before trial. Permits such an amendment to be made at any time if it does not prejudice the substantial rights of the defendant. Provides that if an amendment is made less than 30 days before trial, the court shall grant a continuance to the: (1) state, for good cause shown; or (2) defendant, for any reason. (Current law provides that such an amendment of an indictment or information to include a habitual offender charge must be made: (1) not later than 10 days after the omnibus date; or (2) upon a showing of good cause, at any time before the trial.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Habitual offender charge filing deadline.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 24
2013-04-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-03-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-03-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-18HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 93, nays 0
2013-03-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2013-01-24SenateCosponsor: Rep. Friend
2013-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. McMillin
2013-01-24SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 47 and nays 0
2013-01-22SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2013-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-17SenateSenator Holdman added as second author
2013-01-10SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2013-01-10SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback