IN SB0028 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax sales. Prohibits a person who is delinquent in the payment of personal property taxes or is subject to an existing personal property tax judgment from bidding on or purchasing a tract at a tax sale. Prohibits a business entity from bidding on or purchasing a tract at a tax sale when a person who is prohibited from bidding on or purchasing a tract at a tax sale: (1) formed the business entity; (2) joined with another person or party to form the business entity; (3) joined the business entity as a proprietor, incorporator, partner, shareholder, director, employee, or member; (4) becomes an agent, employee, or board member of the business entity; or (5) is not an attorney at law and represents the business entity in a legal matter. Requires a person to acknowledge that providing false information relating to a prohibited bid or purchase is perjury. Creates a new section of code with revised requirements for the forfeiture of a tax sale purchase by an ineligible bidder. Requires a county treasurer, except for in a county containing a consolidated city, to pay all taxes and assessments that accrue on the tract of real estate through the time the record owner is divested of title from the tax sale surplus fund for the tract. Permits a county legislative body to adopt an ordinance prohibiting the assignment of a certificate of sale prior to the issuance of a tax title deed. Adds requirements that must be met within 150 days of the date a court grants a petition to issue a tax deed before a county auditor can issue or record a tax deed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenatePublic Law 66
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 309: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 93, nays 1
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-23SenateCosponsors: Representatives Olthoff and Aylesworth
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Slager
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-22SenateSenator Melton added as third author
2021-02-22SenateSenator Tomes added as second author
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Niemeyer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/28/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/e/d/9ded5ba8/SB0028.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/3/6/5536bcc5/SB0028.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/b/5/89b5f490/SB0028.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/9/d/339dc79f/SB0028.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/1/2/ec128799/SB0028.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/8/5/bf85bea2/SB0028.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/b/f/64bf60b2/SB0028.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/9/0/15903e23/SB0028.05.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/7/0/ea70d225/SB0028.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/3/7/3237da39/SB0028.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/a/8/f2a8070b/SB0028.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/f/0/0ef0bebb/SB0028.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/8/0/6080ab81/SB0028.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/7/f/b07f5b33/SB0028.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/7/7/d577fc08/SB0028.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/5/f/de5fcfd1/SB0028.03.ENGS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/a/8/aea80fe9/SB0028.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/2/1/f821bdc0/SB0028.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/4/d/ad4d89a4/SB0028.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/7/b/7d7b7096/SB0028.04.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/4/1/3d41a29b/SB0028.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/1/1/3a11c7eb/SB0028.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/5/b/365b298c/SB0028.168_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/d/5/b6d58f32/SB0028.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/d/b/a3db0d75/SB0028.285_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/7/e097cf7e/SB0028.309_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback