IN SB0028 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it a Class B misdemeanor for a person to recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally: (1) rent property; or (2) provide or arrange for the use of property; for the purpose of allowing or enabling a minor to consume an alcoholic beverage on the property. Makes this offense a: (1) Class A misdemeanor if the person has a prior unrelated conviction; and (2) Level 6 felony if the consumption, ingestion, or use of the alcoholic beverage is the proximate cause of the serious bodily injury or death of any person. Provides immunity from civil liability on a postsecondary educational institution or its agents under certain conditions.
Title
Alcohol consumption by a minor.
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 002801 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 002801 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Wesco added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 99: yeas 46 and nays 2 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as third author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as second author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Pete |