IN SB0027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Punitive damages. Provides that certain limitations on punitive damages do not apply to civil actions where the defendant has been charged with committing an act of sexual misconduct and the act of sexual misconduct gives rise to the civil action. Raises cap on punitive damages for such claims to $250,000. Provides that 25% of punitive damages awarded will go to the violent crime victims compensation fund and 75% of the punitive damages awarded will be paid to the person to whom the punitive damages were awarded. Provides that the exception to the punitive damages law does not apply to a cause of action brought against an employer whose liability is based solely on the doctrine of respondeat superior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Punitive damages. Provides that certain limitations on punitive damages do not apply to civil actions where the defendant has been charged with committing an act of sexual misconduct and the act of sexual misconduct gives rise to the civil action. Raises cap on punitive damages for such claims to $250,000. Provides that 25% of punitive damages awarded will go to the violent crime victims compensation fund and 75% of the punitive damages awarded will be paid to the person to whom the punitive damages were awarded. Provides that the exception to the punitive damages law does not apply to a cause of action brought against an employer whose liability is based solely on the doctrine of respondeat superior.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-18SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-14SenateSenator Koch added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2019-02-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 41, nays 6
2019-02-12SenateAmendment #4 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-12SenateAmendment #3 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-12SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-05SenateSenator Ford Jon added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenatePlaced back on second reading
2019-01-29SenateThird reading: call withdrawn
2019-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateSenator Freeman added as coauthor
2019-01-03SenateSenators Merritt and Grooms added as coauthors
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Becker, Head and Ruckelshaus

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback