IN SB0027 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Obstructions at railroad-highway grade crossings. Imposes a minimum judgment of $200 for blocking a railroad-highway grade crossing. Deposits funds collected as judgments in the industrial rail service fund. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee for the 2015 interim period the topic of blocked railroad grade crossings.
Title
Obstructions at railroad-highway grade crossings. Imposes a minimum judgment of $200 for blocking a railroad-highway grade crossing. Deposits funds collected as judgments in the industrial rail service fund. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee for the 2015 interim period the topic of blocked railroad grade crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public Law 162 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 482: yeas 43, nays 3 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-16 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | Representative Forestal added as cosponsor |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 445: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | Reread second time |
2015-04-14 | House | Amendment #3 (Morris) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | House | Amendment #2 (Morris) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned to second reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Representative Cox added as cosponsor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Representative Smaltz added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 44, nays 4 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senators Rogers and Mrvan added as coauthors |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second author |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |