IN SB0025 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a person (which includes an individual, a corporation, and a governmental entity) from adopting or enforcing a policy or rule that prohibits or has the effect of prohibiting an employee of the person (including a contract employee) from legally possessing a firearm that is locked in the employee's vehicle while the vehicle is in or on the person's property. Excepts possession of a firearm: (1) on school property, on property used by a school for a school function, or on a school bus; (2) on certain child care and shelter facility property; (3) on penal facility property; (4) in violation of federal law; (5) on property belonging to an approved postsecondary educational institution; (6) on property belonging to a domestic violence shelter; and (7) at a person's residence. Provides that a person who, in compliance with the prohibition, does not adopt or enforce such a policy or rule is not liable for resulting injury or damage. Authorizes a civil action for damages, costs, attorney's fees, and injunctive relief to remedy a violation. Deletes an outdated reference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms in locked vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2010-01-26 Senator Steele added as second author
2010-01-26 Senator Steele removed as coauthor
2010-01-26 Senators Leising and M. Young added as coauthors
2010-01-25 Cosponsors: Reps. Koch, Blanton and Ruppel
2010-01-25 House sponsor: Rep. Bischoff
2010-01-25 Referred to the House
2010-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: Yeas 41 and Nays 9
2010-01-21 Senators Buck and Schneider added as coauthors
2010-01-21 Amendment 2 (Tallian), failed; Voice Vote
2010-01-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-12 Senators Steele, Hume, Walker, Paul, Waltz, Waterman, Landske, Delph, Kruse, Stutzman and Head added as coauthors
2010-01-12 Senators Hershman, Charbonneau and Bray added as coauthors
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Nugent

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback