IN SB0017 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Campground matters. Allows a campground owner to ask an individual to leave a campground in certain instances. Specifies that an individual who remains on or returns to a campground after having been asked to leave the campground commits criminal trespass. Provides that a guest who is asked to leave a campground is entitled to a refund of any unused portion of prepaid fees.
Title
Campground matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Law 106 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 444: yeas 38, nays 4 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 325: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Miller and Cook |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |