IN SB0016 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Fire protection district per diems. Increases the maximum amount (from $20 to $100) that a member of the board of fire trustees of a fire protection district may receive for each day that the member devotes to the work of the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire protection district per diems. Increases the maximum amount (from $20 to $100) that a member of the board of fire trustees of a fire protection district may receive for each day that the member devotes to the work of the district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2015-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-22SenateSenator Head added as second author
2015-01-22SenateRepresentative Slager added as sponsor
2015-01-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 45, nays 4
2015-01-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-15SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Randolph

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback