IN SB0013 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Select commission on passenger rail. Establishes the select commission on passenger rail (commission) under the Indiana department of transportation (department). Provides for the membership of the commission. Requires the commission to adopt bylaws governing: (1) the activities and procedures of the commission; (2) the powers and duties of the commission and its officers; (3) the appointment procedures and terms of the members of the commission; (4) the voting rights of the members of the commission; (5) the voting procedures of the commission; (6) conducting the business of the commission; and (7) any other matters necessary to fulfill the duties of the commission. Requires the commission to advocate for long-term, sustainable funding to implement and expand passenger rail. Requires the commission to identify and develop public and private partnerships to implement and expand passenger rail. Requires the commission to, before November 1 of each year, publish an annual report regarding the activities of the commission in an electronic format to the legislative council and the legislative services agency for the use of the members of the general assembly. Provides that the commission may: (1) advocate for passenger rail systems included in the State Rail Plan and approved by the department; (2) educate local officials and the public on the advantages of passenger rail service; and (3) establish committees. Provides that the commission may not study, advocate, or promote passenger rail in Marion County.
Title
Select commission on passenger rail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Abbott D, GiaQuinta, Soliday |
2022-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 89: yeas 35, nays 10 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; Roll Call 60: yeas 33, nays 14 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Pol added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |