IN SB0012 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sentencing and bias crimes. Provides that a court may consider bias in imposing a criminal sentence. Specifies the manner in which bias crime data shall be reported to the state police department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing and bias crimes. Provides that a court may consider bias in imposing a criminal sentence. Specifies the manner in which bias crime data shall be reported to the state police department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-21SenateCosponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2019-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 39, nays 10
2019-02-21SenateSenator Randolph removed as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateSenator Taylor G removed as third author
2019-02-19SenateAmendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; Roll Call 148: yeas 33, nays 16
2019-02-19SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-18SenateSenator Taylor G added as third author
2019-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-14SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Public Policy
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Bohacek and Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback