IN SB0012 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Judicial retirement age. Requires justices of the supreme court and judges of the court of appeals to retire at 80 years of age. (Under current law, justices and court of appeals judges must retire at 75 years of age.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial retirement age. Requires justices of the supreme court and judges of the court of appeals to retire at 80 years of age. (Under current law, justices and court of appeals judges must retire at 75 years of age.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-03SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as sponsor
2015-01-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 27, nays 20
2015-01-15SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2015-01-13SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-13SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senators Buck and Rogers

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback