IN SB0010 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide maternal mortality review committee. Includes reporting to the statewide maternal mortality review committee (committee) for the release of mental health records without the consent of the patient. Requires the committee to review cases of maternal mortality involving the death of a woman occurring during pregnancy, through one year after the pregnancy. Requires a health care provider and a health facility to report deaths during pregnancy, through one year after a pregnancy to the committee for review. Requires the committee to review all cases of maternal death. Specifies that a health care provider includes a mental health professional for purposes of the review of records by the committee. Requires the committee to: (1) determine whether an abortion was performed on the individual and whether the abortion contributed to the maternal mortality; (2) determine whether a miscarriage occurred and whether the miscarriage contributed to the maternal mortality; and (3) include the findings in the committee's annual report. Requires the statewide maternal mortality review coordinator to establish a process to report cases to the committee. Changes the expiration date of the statewide maternal mortality review committee to June 30, 2025.
Title
Statewide maternal mortality review committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Law 65 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 308: yeas 45, nays 3 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment #1 (Ziemke) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Barrett, Fleming, Manning |
2021-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 41, nays 6 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 34, nays 10 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senators Glick and Breaux added as coauthors |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Becker added as third author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |