IN SB0010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pension matters. Provides that a member of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF), the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (TRF), or the legislators' defined contribution plan who meets certain age and service requirements may withdraw all or part of the amount in the member's annuity savings account without consequence to the member's pension benefit under the fund and without separating from a covered position. Removes the requirement that a member of PERF, TRF, or the legislators' defined contribution plan wait 30 days after separating from a covered position to withdraw an amount from the member's annuity saving account. Provides that the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system may offer members an alternative option for the payment of the member's retirement benefits that does not include a minimum benefit option. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on pension management oversight.)
Title
Pension matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 51 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 342: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 351: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: VanNatter, Lyness, Beck and Deal |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Burton and Moseley |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Doriot, Niezgodski and Garten |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-27 | House | Representative Moseley added as cosponsor |
2020-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment #2 (Burton) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-24 | House | Representative VanNatter added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 10: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senators Garten, Ford J.D., Niezgodski added as coauthors |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |