IN SB0009 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
Pending: House Family, Children and Human Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Supplemental nutrition assistance program and drug convictions. Removes 12 month limitation on certain individuals receiving supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) benefits. Specifies that, beginning January 1, 2018, Indiana elects to opt out of the federal law prohibiting individuals convicted of certain drug offenses from receiving SNAP assistance if the individual meets specified conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental nutrition assistance program and drug convictions. Removes 12 month limitation on certain individuals receiving supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) benefits. Specifies that, beginning January 1, 2018, Indiana elects to opt out of the federal law prohibiting individuals convicted of certain drug offenses from receiving SNAP assistance if the individual meets specified conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateCosponsor: Representative Frizzell
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Olthoff
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 34, nays 16
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenatePlaced back on second reading
2017-02-02SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-01-31SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-01-31SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-01-30SenateSenator Breaux added as second author
2017-01-24SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2017-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-09SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Family and Children Services
2017-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback