IN SB0008 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Nonprofit bail funding. Allows a charitable organization to pay bail on behalf of a defendant if the organization meets certain criteria. Exempts from the certification requirement a charitable organization that pays bail for not more than two individuals in any 180 day period. Provides that if money or bonds have been set, bail by surety may be substituted for the money or bonds at any time before a breach, unless the court required money bail be posted. Prohibits the state and a political subdivision from: (1) posting bail for any person; or (2) providing a grant to any entity that provides funding for any person. Requires a court to apply the bail to certain court costs. Prohibits an entity that has received a grant from the state or a political subdivision from posting bail for any person or providing a grant, directly or indirectly, to an entity that posts bail for any person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonprofit bail funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24SenateAmendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-24SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-04SenateSenator Baldwin added as coauthor
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2022-01-04SenateCoauthored by Senators Young M and Sandlin
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senators Freeman, Walker K, Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/8/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/4/f/b74fcc02/SB0008.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/4/8/2848dab9/SB0008.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/4/7/9c47fd0f/SB0008.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/4/8/9448c36e/SB0008.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/5/3/4e533f62/SB0008.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/2/a/bf2a1bbe/SB0008.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/0/b/c30b3774/SB0008.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/7/c/6e7c4b08/SB0008.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/6/b/016bf038/SB0008.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/8/1/cb818a6b/SB0008.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/b/e09b0308/SB0008.01.INTR.05.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback