IN SB0008 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study of the growth of health care costs. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee for study during the 2019 interim of the general assembly the factors that are contributing to the growth of health care costs. Requires the interim study committee to report and make any recommendations to the legislative council not later than November 2019.
Title
Study of the growth of health care costs. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee for study during the 2019 interim of the general assembly the factors that are contributing to the growth of health care costs. Requires the interim study committee to report and make any recommendations to the legislative council not later than November 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] |
Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Representative Fleming added as cosponsor |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frizzell |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ruckelshaus |